Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Virginio Cardinal Orsini, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1615BornRome, Italy
16 Dec 164126.5Elevated to Cardinal
10 Feb 164226.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
10 Nov 164227.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
14 Mar 164428.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
21 Jul 165338.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
6 Mar 165640.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
11 Oct 166651.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
14 Nov 166752.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
30 Jan 166852.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
18 Mar 167155.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
30 Mar 167155.8Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Albano
28 Jan 167559.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
21 Aug 167661.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

MicroData Summary for Virginio Orsini:
Virginio Cardinal Orsini O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
  • a cardinal for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1641
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Jun 2011
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1671, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015