Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Scipione de Martinis

Deceased

Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹BornMuro Lucano
9 Apr 166341.2AppointedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
31 Dec 166846.9ResignedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
2 May 167250.3AppointedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
6 Apr 168159.2DiedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Scipione de Martinis
Bishop Scipione de Martinis (born 1622, died ) Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 319
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 230
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Jun 2016