Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccolò Antonio De Tura

Deceased

Bishop of Sarno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹Born
23 Sep 167349.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 167349.9ConfirmedBishop of Sarno, Italy
21 Dec 167349.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sarno, Italy
Jul 1706³82.5DiedBishop of Sarno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Antonio De Tura
Bishop Niccolò Antonio De Tura (born 1624, died Jul 1706) Bishop of Sarno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolofra

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast