Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Bottis, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Minori, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1618Born
17 Nov 167052.8AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
23 Nov 167052.8Ordained BishopBishop of Minori, Italy
1679¹60.9DiedBishop of Minori, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bottis
Bishop Antonio Bottis C.R.S. (born , died 1679) Bishop of Minori

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast