Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Oliva, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Aug 1535AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
25 Aug 1535Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
13 May 1541AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
23 Oct 1544DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Oliva
Archbishop Alfonso Oliva O.S.A. (died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1535, Number 9
  • bp/d: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Sep 2016