Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Guidiccioni

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1500Born
16 Dec 153434.8AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
13 Dec 153737.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
26 Jul 154141.4DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Guidiccioni (VIAF: 88331)
Bishop Giovanni Guidiccioni (born , died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucca, Diocese of Lucca
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 198
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1537, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast