Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martin de Portugal

Deceased

Archbishop of Funchal, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Feb 1533AppointedArchbishop of Funchal, Portugal
17 Aug 1533Ordained BishopArchbishop of Funchal, Portugal
15 Nov 1547DiedArchbishop of Funchal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Martin de Portugal
Archbishop Martin de Portugal (died ) Archbishop of Funchal

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Pietro in Montorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 199
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,010
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1533, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast