Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico de Martinis, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ario, Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Oct 1538AppointedBishop of Ario, Greece
20 Oct 1538Ordained BishopBishop of Ario, Greece
1541²DiedBishop of Ario, Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico de Martinis
Bishop Ludovico de Martinis O.P. (died 1541) Bishop of Ario

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained Bishopsacristie du palais majeur, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 117
  • ob/c2+: AT, 15 Dec 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast