Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel de Sanguesa, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tarazona

Titular Bishop of Rhosus


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Apr 1537AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarazona, Spain
20 Apr 1537AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
3 May 1537Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
1548¹DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Sanguesa:
Bishop Miguel de Sanguesa O. Cist. , Auxiliary Bishop of Tarazona

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 48, Number 250
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 287
  • c2: CB, 17 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Nov 2013