Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Magnasco di Santa Fiora

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Oct 1535AppointedBishop of Castro [del Lazio], Italy
31 Oct 1535Ordained BishopBishop of Castro [del Lazio], Italy
6 Jul 1543AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
1552¹DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Magnasco di Santa Fiora:
Bishop Luigi Magnasco di Santa Fiora , Bishop of Assisi

  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 157, and Page 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1535, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Aug 2014