Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Vannini de Theodoli, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jan 1541AppointedBishop of Scala, Italy
1 May 1541³Ordained BishopBishop of Scala, Italy
7 May 1548AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
10 Jan 1564DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Vannini de Theodoli
Bishop Luigi Vannini de Theodoli C.R.L. (died ) Bishop of Bertinoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlž, Diocese of Forli
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 140, and Page 294
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,541, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast