Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gian Antonio Fassano (Phassarus, Fasside)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Monreale, Italy

Titular Bishop of Christopolis


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jun 1544AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monreale, Italy
4 Jun 1544AppointedTitular Bishop of Christopolis
30 Jun 1544Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Christopolis
10 Sep 1568DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gian Antonio Fassano (Phassarus, Fasside)
Bishop Gian Antonio Fassano (Phassarus, Fasside) (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books, 2,012, 10, 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 166
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,544, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast