Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrique Cardinal de Borja y Aragón

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Squillace, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1518Born
17 Dec 153920.9AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
19 Dec 153921.0Elevated to Cardinal
31 May 154021.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
16 Jun 154021.4Ordained DeaconCardinal-Deacon of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
16 Sep 154021.7DiedBishop-Elect of Squillace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrique de Borja y Aragón
Enrique Cardinal de Borja y Aragón (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Squillace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGandia, Spain

  • a cardinal for .7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1539
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 52, Number 280
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 303
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 243, Number 10
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1539
  • c0: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Apr 2018