Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Józef Gadomski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

Titular Bishop of Benda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1720³BornDuczyminen
16 Dec 174424.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Płock, Poland
2 May 174525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Płock, Poland
23 Sep 178262.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
23 Sep 178262.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
23 Jun 179171.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Józef Gadomski
Bishop Wojciech Józef Gadomski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

  • a priest for 46.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 120, and Page 454
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016