Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Remigiusz Zambrzycki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

Titular Bishop of Dardanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1746³BornZambrzyce Stara Wies
16 Apr 176922.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Dec 176923.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 178135.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
10 Dec 178135.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
26 May 178235.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
1826¹79.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Remigiusz Zambrzycki: VIAF:301215127
Bishop Franciszek Remigiusz Zambrzycki (born , died 1826) Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 192, and Page 454
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 31 Dec 2015