Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Ojeda Pascual, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Ramón, Peru

Titular Bishop of Fissiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1932Born
14 Oct 195321.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
6 Jan 195724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 Mar 198754.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Ramón, Peru
30 Mar 198754.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Fissiana
5 Jul 198755.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fissiana
11 Mar 200370.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of San Ramón, Peru
28 Apr 201381.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Ramón, Peru

MicroData Summary for Julio Ojeda Pascual
Bishop Julio Ojeda Pascual O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Ramón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonasterio de Rodilla

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 29 Apr 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018