Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Wilhelm von Twickel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

Titular Bishop of Arethusa

Vicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1682³BornHavixbeck
11 Apr 170522.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Münster, Germany
18 Jul 171735.0Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
27 Jun 173552.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
27 Jun 173552.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
11 Sep 173553.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
1 Dec 174563.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover), Germany
10 Sep 175775.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Wilhelm von Twickel:
Bishop Johann Wilhelm von Twickel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 98, and Page 452
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 16 Oct 2013