Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christopher Ndizeye Nkoronko

Bishop of Kahama, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1970 Born
5 Jul 200131.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kigoma, Tanzania
23 Jun 202252.2AppointedBishop of Kahama, Tanzania
4 Sep 202252.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kahama, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Christopher Ndizeye Nkoronko
Bishop Christopher Ndizeye Nkoronko (born ) Bishop of Kahama

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalinzi, Diocese of Kigoma
Ordained BishopOutside, Near, Cathedral, Kahama, Diocese of Kahama

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kahama.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2022
  • ob: CB, 28 Aug 2022
  • c2+: CB, 4 Sep 2022
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 253, Number 20,993

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022