Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse Nguyên Huu Long, P.S.S.

Bishop of Vinh, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1953 Born
29 Dec 199037.9Ordained PriestPriest of Đà Nẵng, Viet Nam
15 Jun 201360.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hưng Hóa, Viet Nam
15 Jun 201360.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Gummi in Byzacena
6 Sep 201360.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gummi in Byzacena
22 Dec 201865.9AppointedBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
12 Feb 201966.0InstalledBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Nguyên Huu Long
Bishop Alphonse Nguyên Huu Long P.S.S. (born ) Bishop of Vinh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHà Nôi
Ordained BishopCathedral, Son Tay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vinh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2013
  • ob: CB, 2 Jul 2013
  • c2+: CB, 7 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,859
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2018
  • i: CB, 13 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Feb 2019

Quantcast