Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Angel Nguema Bee, S.D.B.

Bishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1969 Born
19 Jul 199829.0Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Jul 200031.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1 Apr 201747.7AppointedBishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea
20 May 201747.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea
24 May 201747.8InstalledBishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea

MicroData Summary for Miguel Angel Nguema Bee
Bishop Miguel Angel Nguema Bee S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Ebebiyin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBata, Diocese of Bata
Ordained BishopIn front of Inmaculada Concepción, Basilica, Mongomo, Diocese of Mongomo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ebebiyin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2017
  • loc: CB, 6 May 2017
  • c34: CB, 22 May 2017
  • i: CB, 24 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017