Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josse Bouckaert

Deceased

Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583¹BornIveghem
16 Sep 164158.7AppointedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
19 Jan 164259.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
1 Nov 164663.8DiedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josse Bouckaert:
Bishop Josse Bouckaert (died ) Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 19 Mar 2015