Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Villain de Gand

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1588BornLomme
10 Jun 162335.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Dec 162638.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 164658.4AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
1 Dec 164759.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
28 Dec 166678.5DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for François Villain de Gand:
Bishop François Villain de Gand (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 340
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015