Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ladislas Jonnart

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai


Events

DateEventTitle
1651AppointedBishop of Arras, France
31 Jul 1662AppointedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
15 Jul 1669AppointedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
4 Apr 1671InstalledArchbishop of Cambrai, France
22 Sep 1674DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Ladislas Jonnart:
Archbishop Ladislas Jonnart (died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013