Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop André Creusen

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591¹Born
22 May 165160.3AppointedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
23 Jul 165160.5Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
6 Sep 165665.6SelectedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
9 Apr 165766.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
8 Nov 166675.8DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André Creusen
Archbishop André Creusen (born 1591, died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaastricht

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 236
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast