Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Ophovius, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569¹Born
13 Mar 159324.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 162657.0SelectedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
22 Jun 162657.4ConfirmedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
27 Sep 162657.7Ordained BishopBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
4 Nov 163768.8DiedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Ophovius
Bishop Michael Ophovius O.P. (born 1569, died ) Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBois-le-Duc

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 125
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast