Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Sternenberg (de Dusseldorf)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589¹Born
161324.0Converted
19 Mar 161627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
7 Oct 164758.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
7 Oct 164758.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
23 Feb 164859.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
165263.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
7 Sep 166273.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Sternenberg (de Dusseldorf)
Bishop Johann Sternenberg (de Dusseldorf) (born 1589, died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalkar

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast