Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph de Bergaigne, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1588Born
16 Jan 161223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
13 May 164153.0AppointedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
27 Oct 164153.4Ordained BishopBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
28 May 164658.0AppointedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
24 Oct 164759.4DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph de Bergaigne
Archbishop Joseph de Bergaigne O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnvers

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 125, and Page 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1641, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast