Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Imrich Palugyay de Eaden et Bodafalva

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1780Born
26 Aug 180322.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Dec 180323.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 183150.9SelectedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
24 Feb 183251.3ConfirmedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
6 May 183251.5Ordained BishopBishop of Košice, Slovakia
22 Nov 183858.0SelectedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
18 Feb 183958.2ConfirmedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
25 May 183958.5InstalledBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
24 Jul 185877.7DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Imrich Palugyay de Eaden et Bodafalva
Bishop Imrich Palugyay de Eaden et Bodafalva (born , died ) Bishop of Nitra

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalúdzka

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 139, and Page 285
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast