Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antal Juranitz

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1768BornKaposvár
28 Oct 179022.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Jun 179123.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 182556.7SelectedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
27 Jun 182557.0ConfirmedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
15 Aug 182557.2Ordained BishopBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
26 Aug 183769.2DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Antal Juranitz (VIAF: 25784169)
Bishop Antal Juranitz (born , died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 221
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,791
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016