Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Michael Henry Morrissey

Bishop-Elect of Geraldton, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1952 Born
31 Jan 198128.3Ordained PriestPriest of Geraldton, Australia
15 May 201764.6AppointedBishop of Geraldton, Australia
28 Jun 201764.8Ordained BishopBishop of Geraldton, Australia

MicroData Summary for Michael Henry Morrissey
Father Michael Henry Morrissey (born ) Bishop-Elect of Geraldton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt John of God Hospital, Geraldton, Diocese of Geraldton
Ordained PriestSt. Francis Xavier, Cathedral, Geraldton, Diocese of Geraldton

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Geraldton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 May 2017
  • bp/ob/c1+/mn: CB, 15 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017