Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ernst Heinrich Karlen, C.M.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1922Born
22 Jun 194725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
26 Sep 196846.6AppointedBishop of Umtata, South Africa
3 Dec 196846.8Ordained BishopBishop of Umtata, South Africa
9 May 197452.2AppointedBishop of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
10 Jun 199472.3AppointedArchbishop of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
24 Oct 199775.7RetiredArchbishop of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
28 Oct 201290.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Ernst Heinrich Karlen
Archbishop Ernst Heinrich Karlen C.M.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bulawayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTörbel

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 29 Oct 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast