Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Montagnini

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Colombia

Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1863Born
19 Dec 188522.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Feb 191349.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
31 Mar 191349.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
22 Jun 191350.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
24 Oct 191350.3DiedApostolic Delegate to Colombia

MicroData Summary for Carlo Montagnini (VIAF: 89653102)
Archbishop Carlo Montagnini (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Colombia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasale Monferrato, Diocese of Casale Monferrato, Italy
Death PlaceBerlin, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,913, Number 34
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast