Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean-Baptiste Demandre] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Doubs (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1739Born
13 May 179858.5SelectedBishop of [Doubs (Constitutional), France]
17 Jun 179858.6Ordained BishopBishop of [Doubs (Constitutional), France]
Oct 1801³61.9ResignedBishop of [Doubs (Constitutional), France]
21 Mar 182383.4DiedBishop Emeritus of [Doubs (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Demandre
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Demandre (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Doubs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Loup-sur-Semouse
Ordained BishopBesanšon
Death PlaceBesanšon

  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,798, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast