Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Martinez González

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1897BornMancera de Abajo
22 Sep 192326.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 194245.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
29 Mar 194245.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Attaea
29 Jun 194245.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Attaea
14 Dec 195053.9AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
31 Jan 197073.1ResignedBishop of Zamora, Spain
31 Jan 197073.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Segia
11 Dec 197073.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Segia
9 Feb 197982.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Martinez González:
Bishop Eduardo Martinez González (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zamora

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013