Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Paccolat, C.R.A. †

Deceased

Abbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1823Born
1843¹19.7ProfessedMember of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
19 Apr 185128.0Ordained PriestPriest of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
4 Dec 188865.6SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
5 Feb 188965.8ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
5 Feb 188965.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
5 May 188966.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
6 Apr 190986.0DiedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Paccolat (VIAF: 305960123)
Bishop Joseph Paccolat C.R.A. (born , died ) Abbot of Saint-Maurice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCollonges, Territorial Abbey of Saint-Maurice
Ordained BishopSt. Maurice d'Agaune, Territorial Abbey of Saint-Maurice

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 148
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017