Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Paul Stumpf

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1822BornHeguisheim
18 Dec 184725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
9 Apr 188158.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
13 May 188158.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
13 May 188158.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
24 Aug 188158.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
25 Feb 188360.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Strasbourg, France
17 Nov 188765.2SucceededBishop of Strasbourg, France
10 Aug 189067.9DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Paul Stumpf:
Bishop Pierre-Paul Stumpf (born , died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 120, and Page 167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013