Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Cingari

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1709Born
19 Dec 173324.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 174737.9AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
26 Nov 174737.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
17 Jun 176858.5DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Cingari
Bishop Giacomo Cingari (born , died ) Bishop of Gubbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 210
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,747, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast