Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sergio Melillo

Bishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1955 Born
9 Sep 198933.8Ordained PriestPriest of Avellino, Italy
23 May 201559.5AppointedBishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
31 Jul 201559.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
9 Aug 201559.7InstalledBishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sergio Melillo
Bishop Sergio Melillo (born ) Bishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvellino

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 May 2015
  • ob: CB, 8 Jun 2015
  • i: CB, 9 Jun 2015
  • c2: CB, 15 Jun 2015
  • c2+: CB, 17 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,554

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast