Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel Miroff (Mirov)

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis

Titular See: Theodosiopolis per Greco-Bulgaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1860Born
6 Jan 188322.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 190646.5SelectedTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis
8 Jan 190746.6ConfirmedTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis
19 Feb 190746.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis
17 Aug 192363.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis

MicroData Summary for Michel Miroff (Mirov)
Archbishop Michel Miroff (Mirov) (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTopouslar [Toposlari]

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921, Page 314
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1907, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast