Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihail Petkov

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tracia (Hadrianopolis) (Bulgarian), Turkey

Titular Bishop of Hebron


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1850Born
10 Apr 188332.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tracia (Hadrianopolis) (Bulgarian), Turkey
10 Apr 188332.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
22 Apr 188332.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hebron
27 May 192170.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Tracia (Hadrianopolis) (Bulgarian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Mihail Petkov
Bishop Mihail Petkov (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tracia (Hadrianopolis)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdrianopoli
Ordained BishopSt Esprit, Constantinpole

  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Feb 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 300
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,224
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,883, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast