Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Stamati

Deceased

Bishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1912BornPlataci
2 May 193522.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 196754.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
25 Mar 196754.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Stephaniacum
29 Jun 196755.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Stephaniacum
20 Feb 197966.6AppointedBishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
7 Jun 198774.9DiedBishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Stamati:
Bishop Giovanni Stamati (born , died ) Bishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015