Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Pietro Tesauri

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1882Born
17 Jun 190522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Emilia, Italy
13 Mar 193350.2AppointedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
25 May 193350.4Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
16 Jun 193350.5InstalledBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
25 May 193956.4AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
3 Sep 193956.7InstalledArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
25 Aug 194562.7DiedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pietro Tesauri
Archbishop Francesco Pietro Tesauri (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCavriago

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 26
  • opd/c1/i: CB, 31 Dec 2014
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast