Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Medeiros Leite

Deceased

Bishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1898BornMossoro
29 May 192425.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Aug 194546.7AppointedBishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Oct 194546.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais, Brazil
6 Mar 197778.3DiedBishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José de Medeiros Leite:
Bishop José de Medeiros Leite (born , died ) Bishop of Oliveira

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013