Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josip Marušić

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1869Born
24 Jul 189223.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
26 Jul 189223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
16 Jun 191546.4AppointedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
3 Oct 191546.7Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
18 Apr 1930³61.2DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josip Marušić
Bishop Josip Marušić (born , died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePraputnjak

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 65
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast