Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Broto y Pérez

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 May 1720AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
15 Sep 1720Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
8 Apr 1736DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Broto y Pérez
Bishop Tomás Broto y Pérez (died ) Bishop of Solsona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,644
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 38, Number 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,720, Number 37
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 153

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast