Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Gómez de la Torre

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1689³BornRiaño
2 Dec 174859.3AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
9 Mar 174959.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
24 May 175666.7AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
3 Aug 175969.9DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Gómez de la Torre:
Bishop Pedro Gómez de la Torre (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 66, Number 312
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 166, and Page 340

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015