Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Zorrilla de Sanmartín

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1691³Born
20 Jan 174957.8AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
23 Mar 174958.0Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
30 Sep 176271.5DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Zorrilla de Sanmartín
Bishop José Zorrilla de Sanmartín (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValle de Ruesca

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 67, Number 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 40
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 362

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast