Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Gasch (Casch), O.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1653BornAlcora, Spain
23 Apr 167118.1ProfessedMember of Order of the Minims
26 Nov 170350.7AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
30 Nov 170350.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
18 Jan 170450.9InstalledArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
11 Jun 172976.3DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for José Gasch (Casch):
Archbishop José Gasch (Casch) O.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 306
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 23, Number 28
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015