Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augstín González Pisador

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1709³Born
20 May 175444.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
20 May 175444.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
30 Jun 175444.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
21 Jul 176051.0AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
17 Mar 179181.6DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augstín González Pisador
Bishop Augstín González Pisador (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Nava del Rey

  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 322, and Page 415
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 452
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 72, Number 348
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,754, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast