Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Clemente de Aróstegui (Aristegui)

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1692²BornVillanueva de la Jara
30 Jul 174250.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Toledo, Spain
30 Jul 174250.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
4 Nov 174250.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
16 Sep 174755.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Osma, Spain
29 Aug 176068.7DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Clemente de Aróstegui (Aristegui):
Archbishop Pedro Clemente de Aróstegui (Aristegui) (died ) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 254, and Page 322
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 61, Number 282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 8 Dec 2013